AR SB520 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB520 is now Act 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB520 is now Act 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The State Insurance Department's Regulatory And Enforcement Authority Concerning Pharmacy Benefits Managers; And To Modify The Arkansas Pharmacy Benefits Manager Licensure Act.
Title
To Clarify The State Insurance Department's Regulatory And Enforcement Authority Concerning Pharmacy Benefits Managers; And To Modify The Arkansas Pharmacy Benefits Manager Licensure Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Notification that SB520 is now Act 994 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2019-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 5 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |