AR SB520 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB520 is now Act 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The State Insurance Department's Regulatory And Enforcement Authority Concerning Pharmacy Benefits Managers; And To Modify The Arkansas Pharmacy Benefits Manager Licensure Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The State Insurance Department's Regulatory And Enforcement Authority Concerning Pharmacy Benefits Managers; And To Modify The Arkansas Pharmacy Benefits Manager Licensure Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB520 is now Act 994
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-09SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-09SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-09HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-04SenateAmendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 5
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-02SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-04-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-02SenateAmendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2019-03-26SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-26SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-03-12SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-12SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-12SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback