AR SB515 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Heritage Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Heritage Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-02SenateThe vote by which SB515 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-02SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-07SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback