AR SB5 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Initiated Act 1 Of 2000; To Authorize The Transfer Of Funds From The Arkansas Healthy Century Trust Fund To The Long Term Reserve Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Initiated Act 1 Of 2000; To Authorize The Transfer Of Funds From The Arkansas Healthy Century Trust Fund To The Long Term Reserve Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateNotification that SB5 is now Act 7
2017-05-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-05-03SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-05-03SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-05-03HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-05-03HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-05-03SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-05-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-05-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2017-05-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-05-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-05-02SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-05-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-05-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-05-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-05-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2017-05-01SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback