AR SB483 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Notification that SB483 is now Act 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Notification that SB483 is now Act 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Acts 2023, No. 278; To Amend The Law Regarding Bonds Or Acceptable Financial Security Under The Customer Protections For Net-metering Customers Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Acts 2023, No. 278; To Amend The Law Regarding Bonds Or Acceptable Financial Security Under The Customer Protections For Net-metering Customers Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Notification that SB483 is now Act 476 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-30 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed |