AR SB471 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB471 is now Act 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Laws Concerning Local Government Bonds; And To Allow A Municipality's Or County's Portion Of The Net Casino Gaming Receipts Tax Revenues To Be Pledged For The Repayment Of Certain Local Government Bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Laws Concerning Local Government Bonds; And To Allow A Municipality's Or County's Portion Of The Net Casino Gaming Receipts Tax Revenues To Be Pledged For The Repayment Of Certain Local Government Bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateNotification that SB471 is now Act 703
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-25HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-07SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback