AR SB469 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Withdrawn by author.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish A Process To Review Presidential Executive Orders; To Allow The Attorney General To Review Presidential Executive Orders; And To Address Implementation Of A Presidential Executive Order Under Review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish A Process To Review Presidential Executive Orders; To Allow The Attorney General To Review Presidential Executive Orders; And To Address Implementation Of A Presidential Executive Order Under Review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateWithdrawn by author.
2021-04-19SenateReturned From the House as requested.
2021-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as requested.
2021-03-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-15SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback