AR SB448 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that SB448 is now Act 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that SB448 is now Act 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Expand The Ability Of The State To Negotiate Contracts; To Define "collusion" Under Arkansas Procurement Law; And To Require Review Of A Contract Before It Is Ratified Or Affirmed.
Title
To Expand The Ability Of The State To Negotiate Contracts; To Define "collusion" Under Arkansas Procurement Law; And To Require Review Of A Contract Before It Is Ratified Or Affirmed.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Notification that SB448 is now Act 696 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | The vote by which SB 448 PASSED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |