AR SB446 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Notification that SB446 is now Act 526
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Notification that SB446 is now Act 526
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase The Maximum Job Order Contracting Bid Award Amount.
Title
To Increase The Maximum Job Order Contracting Bid Award Amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Notification that SB446 is now Act 526 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Filed |