AR SB442 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB442 is now Act 943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB442 is now Act 943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify That All Public School Buildings Are Exempt From Taxation.
Title
To Clarify That All Public School Buildings Are Exempt From Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Notification that SB442 is now Act 943 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |