AR SB422 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that SB422 is now Act 453
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that SB422 is now Act 453
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Definition Of "exempt Commodities And Services" In The Arkansas Procurement Law.
Title
Concerning The Definition Of "exempt Commodities And Services" In The Arkansas Procurement Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Notification that SB422 is now Act 453 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Filed |