AR SB384 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB384 is now Act 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB384 is now Act 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Campaign Contributions; To Amend Campaign Practices; And To Amend Portions Of The Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Campaign Contributions; To Amend Campaign Practices; And To Amend Portions Of The Law Resulting From Initiated Act 1 Of 1990 And Initiated Act 1 Of 1996.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Notification that SB384 is now Act 385 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2021-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |