AR SB384 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that SB384 is now Act 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that SB384 is now Act 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Consistency In The Reimbursement Of Educational Costs For Students Who Are Placed In A Residential Or Inpatient Facility That Is Located In A Bordering State.
Title
To Provide For Consistency In The Reimbursement Of Educational Costs For Students Who Are Placed In A Residential Or Inpatient Facility That Is Located In A Bordering State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Notification that SB384 is now Act 523 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |