AR SB381 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And To Require Certain Regular Training Of Public Governing Bodies.
Title
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And To Require Certain Regular Training Of Public Governing Bodies.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed |