AR SB380 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB380 is now Act 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB380 is now Act 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend The Uniform Attendance And Leave Policy Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
An Act To Amend The Uniform Attendance And Leave Policy Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Jim Wooten [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D] |
Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Notification that SB380 is now Act 378 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-15 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |