AR SB376 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB376 is now Act 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB376 is now Act 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Acts Of The General Assembly Amending The Arkansas Constitution; To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Constitution; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Acts Of The General Assembly Amending The Arkansas Constitution; To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Constitution; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB376 is now Act 694 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2019-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |