AR SB373 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Exempt Attorney-client Communications And Attorney Work Product From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967.
Title
To Exempt Attorney-client Communications And Attorney Work Product From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The vote by which SB 373 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1, 2, & 3 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1, 2, & 3. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2017-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-01 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Filed |