AR SB361 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that SB361 is now Act 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that SB361 is now Act 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create An Exemption From The Laws Regarding The Practice Of Pharmacy For Dialysate Or Devices Necessary For Home Peritoneal Kidney Dialysis In Certain Situations.
Title
To Create An Exemption From The Laws Regarding The Practice Of Pharmacy For Dialysate Or Devices Necessary For Home Peritoneal Kidney Dialysis In Certain Situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB361 is now Act 722 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |