AR SB356 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB356 is now Act 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB356 is now Act 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 4 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Business And Commercial Law.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 4 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Business And Commercial Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB356 is now Act 379 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2019-03-05 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2019-03-05 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |