AR SB350 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase The Percentage For Damages On Loss Claims Under An Insurance Policy.
Title
To Increase The Percentage For Damages On Loss Claims Under An Insurance Policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2023-03-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-03-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |