AR SB34 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The "public Officer And Employee Integrity Act Of 2017"; To Create A Special Revenue Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Establish The "public Officer And Employee Integrity Act Of 2017"; To Create A Special Revenue Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-25 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Filed |