AR SB336 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Notification that SB336 is now Act 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Additional Revenue For The Maintenance And Repair Of Highways, Streets, And Bridges In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Additional Revenue For The Maintenance And Repair Of Highways, Streets, And Bridges In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateNotification that SB336 is now Act 416
2019-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-05SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-04SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-04HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-02-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-21SenateRules suspended.
2019-02-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-18SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2019-02-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2019-02-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback