AR SB334 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate Notification that SB334 is now Act 203
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate Notification that SB334 is now Act 203
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Tie Votes Occurring At General Primary Elections.
Title
Concerning Tie Votes Occurring At General Primary Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Senate Notification that SB334 is now Act 203 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-03 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-03 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-03 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-02 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-02-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Filed |