AR SB314 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Conditions Under Which A Public School District Shall Be Returned To Local Control.
Title
To Establish The Conditions Under Which A Public School District Shall Be Returned To Local Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |