AR SB304 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Healthy Lifestyle Education Act Of 2019; And To Ensure The Health Curriculum In Arkansas Public Schools Addresses Certain Health Issues Facing Students.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Healthy Lifestyle Education Act Of 2019; And To Ensure The Health Curriculum In Arkansas Public Schools Addresses Certain Health Issues Facing Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |