AR SB273 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Public School To Employ A Person Who Is A Family Member Of A Board Member As A Teacher In A Critical Teaching Shortage Area.
Title
To Allow A Public School To Employ A Person Who Is A Family Member Of A Board Member As A Teacher In A Critical Teaching Shortage Area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | House Returned to the Senate at Sine Die Adjournment | |
2011-02-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB273 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/SB273.pdf |