AR SB265 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB265 is now Act 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB265 is now Act 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Reorganize The Riverside Vocational And Technical School Into The Corrections School System.
Title
To Reorganize The Riverside Vocational And Technical School Into The Corrections School System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB265 is now Act 497 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |