AR SB253 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Notification that SB253 is now Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Notification that SB253 is now Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Historic Rehabilitation Income Tax Credit Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Historic Rehabilitation Income Tax Credit Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Notification that SB253 is now Act 393 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-02 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-02-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-02-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |