AR SB239 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB239 is now Act 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB239 is now Act 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Minimum Levels For Employee Benefit Stop-loss Insurance.
Title
To Clarify The Minimum Levels For Employee Benefit Stop-loss Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Notification that SB239 is now Act 383 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-03-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Filed |