AR SB234 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Retirement Eligibility, Noncontributory Members, Member Contributions, And The Benefit Multiplier Under The State Police Retirement System.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Retirement Eligibility, Noncontributory Members, Member Contributions, And The Benefit Multiplier Under The State Police Retirement System.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Rapert [R] | Rep. Stu Smith [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] |
Rep. Mark Berry [R] | Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R] | Rep. Rick McClure [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] |
Rep. Cameron Cooper [R] | Rep. Cindy Crawford [R] | Rep. Danny Watson [R] | Rep. Carlton Wing [R] |
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Filed |