AR SB232 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Notification that SB232 is now Act 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Notification that SB232 is now Act 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Student Whose Parent Or Legal Guardian Relocates Him Or Her To A Different School District To Complete His Or Her Remaining School Years At The School District In Which He Or She Is Enrolled At The Time Of Relocation.
Title
To Allow A Student Whose Parent Or Legal Guardian Relocates Him Or Her To A Different School District To Complete His Or Her Remaining School Years At The School District In Which He Or She Is Enrolled At The Time Of Relocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB232 is now Act 189 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-02-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed |