AR SB23 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Electric Cooperative Corporation Self-regulation Act Of 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Electric Cooperative Corporation Self-regulation Act Of 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateSine Die adjournment
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-03-17SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2021-03-02SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-03-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-02SenateAmendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
2021-02-09SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-02-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-09SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2021-02-01SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-02-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-01SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-01SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-01-26SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-01-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-26SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-01-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2020-12-21SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback