AR SB228 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB228 is now Act 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB228 is now Act 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Organizational Procedures Of City Councils.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Organizational Procedures Of City Councils.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB228 is now Act 235 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed |