AR SB210 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Notification that SB210 is now Act 1369
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Notification that SB210 is now Act 1369
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Child Care And Early Childhood Education Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Child Care And Early Childhood Education Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | Senate | Notification that SB210 is now Act 1369 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2013-04-17 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2013-04-17 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-04-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed |