AR SB208 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Notification that SB208 is now Act 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Notification that SB208 is now Act 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Senate Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Senate Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Notification that SB208 is now Act 96 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2015-02-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed |