AR SB2 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 595
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Notification that SB2 is now Act 595
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require That A Voter Provide Proof Of Identity When Voting And To Provide For The Issuance Of A Voter Identification Card.
Title
An Act To Require That A Voter Provide Proof Of Identity When Voting And To Provide For The Issuance Of A Voter Identification Card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - The House of Representatives, on reconsideration, overrode the Governor's veto on SB2. (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - The vote to override the Governor's veto passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate rejected the recommendation of the Rules Committee that SB2 required a 2/3 vote (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - The vote to override the Governor's veto passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate rejected the recommendation of the Rules Committee that SB2 required a 2/3 vote (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Notification that SB2 is now Act 595 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to Secretary of the State |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House of Representatives having overriden the Governor''s Veto |
2013-04-01 | House | Ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-01 | House | The House of Representatives, on reconsideration, overrode the Governor's veto on SB2. |
2013-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The vote to override the Governor's veto passed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate rejected the recommendation of the Rules Committee that SB2 required a 2/3 vote |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the committee with the recommendation that does not agree with the ruling of the chair SB2 requires the majority vote for Passage |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Rules, Resolutions and Memorials |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-13 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion for immediate consideration passed. |
2013-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Motion for Immediate Consideration |
2013-02-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Filed |