AR SB199 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Notification that SB199 is now Act 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Notification that SB199 is now Act 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Medical Malpractice And Gender Transition In Minors; And To Create The Protecting Minors From Medical Malpractice Act Of 2023.
Title
Concerning Medical Malpractice And Gender Transition In Minors; And To Create The Protecting Minors From Medical Malpractice Act Of 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Notification that SB199 is now Act 274 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Filed |