AR SB197 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Certain Restrictions On The Regulation Of Short-term Rentals; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Certain Restrictions On The Regulation Of Short-term Rentals; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2023-03-16HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-16HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-16HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-23HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-02-23SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-02-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-20SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-02-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2023-02-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=sb197&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197%2FSB197022020231018.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197%2FSB197030620230941.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197%2FSB197031620230941.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197-S1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB197-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB197&rcs=265&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback