AR SB19 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Deter Acts Of Violence Against A Law Enforcement Officer, A Firefighter, A First Responder, Or A Family Member Of A Law Enforcement Officer, Firefighter, Or First Responder; And To Create A Sentence Enhancement.
Title
To Deter Acts Of Violence Against A Law Enforcement Officer, A Firefighter, A First Responder, Or A Family Member Of A Law Enforcement Officer, Firefighter, Or First Responder; And To Create A Sentence Enhancement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB19 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SB19.pdf |