AR SB173 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB173 is now Act 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB173 is now Act 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning State-funded Law Enforcement Academies.
Title
Concerning State-funded Law Enforcement Academies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Notification that SB173 is now Act 183 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |