AR SB172 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Definition Of A Noninstructional Duty To Include The Supervision Of Students During Recess.
Title
To Amend The Definition Of A Noninstructional Duty To Include The Supervision Of Students During Recess.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Brian Evans [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 6 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed |