AR SB170 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB170 is now Act 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that SB170 is now Act 375
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The Unlawful Doxxing Of A Minor On Social Media.
Title
To Prohibit The Unlawful Doxxing Of A Minor On Social Media.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Notification that SB170 is now Act 375 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |