AR SB159 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB159 is now Act 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB159 is now Act 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Law Enforcement Agencies For Private Colleges And Universities; And To Allow Private Schools To Establish And Appoint An Institutional Law Enforcement Officer.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Law Enforcement Agencies For Private Colleges And Universities; And To Allow Private Schools To Establish And Appoint An Institutional Law Enforcement Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB159 is now Act 535 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Filed |