AR SB153 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that SB153 is now Act 725
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Workforce Expansion Act Of 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Workforce Expansion Act Of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateNotification that SB153 is now Act 725
2021-04-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-13SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-13SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-13SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-12HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-10SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-10SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-10SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback