AR SB153 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Notification that SB153 is now Act 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require School-level Improvement, Professional Development, Curriculum, And Graduate Studies Plans To Be In Accordance With The Science Of Reading.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require School-level Improvement, Professional Development, Curriculum, And Graduate Studies Plans To Be In Accordance With The Science Of Reading.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateNotification that SB153 is now Act 83
2019-02-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-07SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-07SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-07HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-31HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-01-31SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-01-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-01-30SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback