AR SB150 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Retirement Benefits; And To Prohibit Collection Of Benefits By Members, Retirants, Or Beneficiaries Of Retirement Systems Who Are Convicted Of Certain Offenses.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Retirement Benefits; And To Prohibit Collection Of Benefits By Members, Retirants, Or Beneficiaries Of Retirement Systems Who Are Convicted Of Certain Offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Joint Retirement & Social Security Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2023-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2023-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed |