AR SB15 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Notification that SB15 is now Act 268
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Career Education Reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Career Education Reappropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Senate Notification that SB15 is now Act 268
2012-03-02 Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2012-03-02 Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2012-03-02 Senate ORDERED ENROLLED
2012-03-02 Senate Returned from the House as passed.
2012-03-02 House Returned To Senate as Passed.
2012-03-02 House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2012-03-02 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2012-03-02 House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2012-03-02 House RULES SUSPENDED
2012-03-01 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2012-03-01 House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2012-03-01 Senate Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2012-03-01 Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2012-03-01 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2012-03-01 Senate Rules suspended.
2012-03-01 Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2012-02-29 Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2012-02-13 Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2012-02-07 Senate Prefiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback