AR SB146 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB146 is now Act 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Laws Concerning Telemedicine; And To Create The Telemedicine Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Laws Concerning Telemedicine; And To Create The Telemedicine Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20SenateNotification that SB146 is now Act 203
2017-02-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-02-16SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-02-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-02-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-02-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-02-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-09SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-09SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-02-08SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2017-02-06SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-02-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-06SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-06SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-02-02SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-02-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-02SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-02-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-01-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback