AR SB144 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that SB144 is now Act 511
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Death Benefit Provisions Under The State Police Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Death Benefit Provisions Under The State Police Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateNotification that SB144 is now Act 511
2019-03-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-14SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-14SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-14HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-03-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback