AR SB143 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that SB143 is now Act 745
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that SB143 is now Act 745
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Ensure That Beneficiaries Of The Arkansas Medicaid Program Have Access To New Products And Label Expansions Approved By The United States Food And Drug Administration.
Title
To Ensure That Beneficiaries Of The Arkansas Medicaid Program Have Access To New Products And Label Expansions Approved By The United States Food And Drug Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Notification that SB143 is now Act 745 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed |